Cwm Taf People First

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE ORGANISATION : EMPOWERS PEOPLE WITH LEARNING DISABILITIES TO CHALLENGE PREJUDICE AND DISCRIMINATION. INCREASES AWARENESS ABOUT THE IMPORTANCE OF EQUALITY AND RIGHTS THROUGH TRAINING, EDUCATION AND SUPPORT. OFFERS OPPORTUNITIES TO DEVELOP SELF ADVOCACY SKILLS AND CONFIDENCE MAKES SURE PEOPLE HAVE A SAY IN DECISION MAKING THROUGHOUT RHONDDA CYNON TAFF AND SURROUNDING AREAS
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £280,448 from 6 government contract(s) and £21,463 from 3 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Blaenau Gwent
- Merthyr Tydfil
- Rhondda Cynon Taff
- Torfaen
Governance
- 14 May 2009: Standard registration
- RCT PEOPLE FIRST (Working name)
- RCT PEOPLE FIRST (Previous name)
- RCT PEOPLE FIRST LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steven Walden Dr | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Honeyman | Trustee | 01 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
PHILLIP MORGAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MS LYNNE EVANS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £234.84k | £399.97k | £415.87k | £432.13k | £457.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £224.64k | £297.62k | £321.97k | £396.67k | £370.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £280.45k | |
|
Income from government grants | £218.63k | £231.44k | £277.34k | £326.89k | £21.46k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 04 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 04 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 09 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 24 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 07 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 07 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 04 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 04 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION CONVERSION DATED 16 JUN 2022 as amended on 07 Oct 2022
Charitable objects
To relieve and support people with a learning difficulties living and working primarily, but not exclusively in the Rhondda Cynon Taff area through services which enable people with learning difficulties to obtain their full rights and privileges as citizens and to advance the education of the general public about the educational , physical, emotional and psychological needs of people with learning difficulties and to advance and promote education of all people with learning difficulties through training, workshops and group work.
Area of benefit
RHONDDA CYNON TAFF AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
Tre-Rhondda Chapel
The Strand
Ferndale
Rhondda Cynon Taff
CF43 4LY
- Phone:
- 01443735479
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window