Financial history ABUNDANTE VIDA CHURCH

Charity number: 1128570
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £164.29k £156.98k £121.78k £141.16k £177.81k
Total expenditure £123.90k £176.09k £155.38k £150.01k £177.75k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £18.46k £24.23k £16.43k N/A N/A