Financial history YOUTH PROJECTS 4WHEELS

Charity number: 1135904
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2013 30/06/2014 30/06/2015 30/06/2016 30/06/2017
Total gross income £100.91k £42.12k £36.16k £5.67k £2.00k
Total expenditure £17.61k £4.97k £13.29k £8.60k £14.77k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A