YOUTH PROJECTS 4WHEELS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To manage and promote the sport of BMX in Nottingham and surrounding areas To manage the BMX track in Bulwell Nottingham To give financial assistance to young people wanting to participate in the sport by donating equipment and safety clothing To promote coaching of BMX to educational establishments in the area
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Nottingham City
Governance
- 12 May 2010: Standard registration
- 12 February 2024: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2013 | 30/06/2014 | 30/06/2015 | 30/06/2016 | 30/06/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £100.91k | £42.12k | £36.16k | £5.67k | £2.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.61k | £4.97k | £13.29k | £8.60k | £14.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 10 MARCH 2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 10 APRIL 2010 ACCEPTED AT COMPANIES HOUSE 23 APRIL 2010
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF NOTTINGHAM AND THE SURROUNDING AREA. IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, AMONGST YOUNG PEOPLE WITH DISABILITIES BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR CYCLING. TO ADVANCE AMONGST PARTICIPANTS THE EDUCATION IN ROAD SAFETY AND THE SAFE USE OF BICYCLES INCLUDING THEIR MAINTENANCE.
Area of benefit
NOTTINGHAM AND THE SURROUNDING AREA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window