MOISHE AND ESTHER ITZINGER FOUNDATION LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Making grants to institutions and other charities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Barnet
- Hackney
Governance
- 27 March 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SAMUEL MAURICE ITZINGER | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Arie Jakubowitch | Trustee | 25 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andre Freudenberger | Trustee | 25 November 2021 |
|
|||||
Allen Joshua Eder | Trustee | 25 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
ESTHER ITZINGER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £270.29k | £342.69k | £277.37k | £310.82k | £349.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £209.91k | £250.56k | £316.57k | £686.55k | £662.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 24 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 24 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 9 MARCH 2009
Charitable objects
ADVANCEMENT OF THE ORTHODOX JEWISH FAITH ADVANCEMENT OF ORTHODOX JEWISH RELIGIOUS EDUCATION THE RELIEF OF POVERTY SICKNESS AND INFIRMITY AMONGST MEMBERS OF THE JEWISH FAITH AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF SUCH OTHER OBJECTS AS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AND ARE CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO ENGLISH LAW.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
43 BRIDGE LANE
LONDON
NW11 0ED
- Phone:
- 02084551707
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window