Financial history ASECONDCHANCE LTD

Charity number: 1131446
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £142.22k £167.13k £122.86k £154.84k £104.40k
Total expenditure £135.27k £177.91k £121.89k £155.08k £112.63k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A