Accounts and annual returns REDEEMED CHRISTIAN CHURCH OF GOD ('RCCG') - RESURRECTION AND RESTORATION PARISH

Charity number: 1128583
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 16 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 16 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 02 July 2024 153 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 02 July 2024 153 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 12 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 12 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 24 March 2022 52 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 24 March 2022 52 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 29 April 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 29 April 2020 On Time Download Open in new window