SHRI RAM CHANDRA MISSION UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF PUBLIC HEALTH THROUGH THE PRACTICE OF THE SAHAJ MARG SYSTEM OF MEDITATION, ALSO KNOWN AS HEARTFULNESS MEDITATION AND HEARTFULNESS UK
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
166 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 18 March 2009: Standard registration
- HEARTFULNESS UK (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DR ANTHONY THOMAS CULLEN | Trustee | 26 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
LYNN MARY GEDDES | Trustee | 26 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tejal Rathod | Trustee | 21 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
PANKAJ SRIVASTAVA | Trustee | 23 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Karthikeyan RENGARAJAN | Trustee | 05 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
Margret Anne Barnes | Trustee | 11 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
JUDITH NELSON | Trustee | 27 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
KAREN DEVLIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr ROSALIND JANE PEARMAIN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £94.01k | £53.35k | £68.63k | £73.30k | £82.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £110.08k | £64.80k | £55.30k | £61.05k | £103.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £500 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 24 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 02 November 2022 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 02 November 2022 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 31 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 10 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 10 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 5 DECEMBER 2008 as amended on 01 Nov 2019
Charitable objects
THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF PUBLIC HEALTH THROUGH THE PRACTICE OF THE SAHAJ MARG SYSTEM OF MEDITATION.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
27 Sullivan Road
TONBRIDGE
TN10 4DD
- Phone:
- 07877733694
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window