Financial history 1ST MOUNTSORREL SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 1128610
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022 28/02/2023 29/02/2024
Total gross income £29.81k £24.67k £27.36k £36.84k £37.99k
Total expenditure £32.09k £12.49k £11.92k £76.31k £46.69k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £16.24k £12.76k N/A £3.84k