1ST MOUNTSORREL SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Scout Group
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
Total income includes £3,835 from 1 government grant(s)
People

13 Trustee(s)
17 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 17 March 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Matthew Prisk | Chair | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
CAROL LYNN BLACK | Trustee | 22 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Bowler | Trustee | 22 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alison Hatton | Trustee | 22 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Helen Preston | Trustee | 14 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jonathon Osborn | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter Wood | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael Holt | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Ward | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Melanie Sullivan | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
duncan stanley | Trustee | 05 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Alison MAckie | Trustee | 05 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
KARL MICHAEL WILSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £29.81k | £24.67k | £27.36k | £36.84k | £37.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £32.09k | £12.49k | £11.92k | £76.31k | £46.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £16.24k | £12.76k | N/A | £3.84k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 04 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 04 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 06 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 06 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 11 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | 11 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 23 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 10 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | 10 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER GRANTED 4 JANUARY 1912
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE DEVELOPMENT OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN ACHIEVING THEIR FULL PHYSICAL, INTELLECTUAL, SOCIAL AND SPIRITUAL POTENTIAL; AS INDIVIDUALS, AS RESPONSIBLE CITIZENS AND AS MEMBERS OF THEIR LOCAL, NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL COMMUNITIES
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
17 SOWTERS LANE
BURTON-ON-THE-WOLDS
LOUGHBOROUGH
LE12 5AL
- Phone:
- 01509880438
- Email:
- cazzablack@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window