NEW BORDERLINE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principal activity of the Charity is to help vulnerable Scots in and around London who are homeless or inadequately housed. New Borderline offers assistance to anyone in need, regardless of age, creed, race or circumstances.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout London
Governance
- 18 March 2009: Standard registration
- 02 February 2024: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 02 February 2024: Funds transferred to 207326 THE SCOTTISH HOSPITAL OF THE FOUNDATION OF KING CH...
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £211.77k | £318.47k | £227.05k | £324.42k | £163.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £200.86k | £228.61k | £254.70k | £227.65k | £240.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 December 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 30 December 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 December 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 11/03/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15/01/2014
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE TO RELIEVE, EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY, PERSONS RESIDENT OR FOUND WITHIN A RADIUS OF 35 MILES OF CHARING CROSS (OR SUCH GREATER DISTANCE WITHIN GREATER LONDON AS MAY BE DETERMINED BY THE TRUSTEES IN INDIVIDUAL CASES) WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS. TO BE ELIGIBLE FOR RELIEF APPLICANTS MUST BE:- (A) A PERSON BORN IN SCOTLAND; (B) THE CHILD OF A PERSON BORN IN SCOTLAND; (C) THE WIDOW, WIDOWER OR SURVIVING CIVIL PARTNER OF A PERSON BORN IN SCOTLAND; OR (D) ANY OTHER PERSON WHOM THE TRUSTEES RECOGNISE AS BEING OF SCOTTISH DESCENT OR EXTRACTION.
Area of benefit
CHARING CROSS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window