PELTON FELL COMMUNITY PARTNERSHIP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Activities include: Family learning for 0 - 5 Lifestyle and Exercise classes Advice, Support and Guidance on Employment, Benefit and other matters Older peoples groups Adult learning courses IT services for residents Young peoples groups 6 - 12, 13 - 19 Health Sessions Environmental projects. Sports activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £28,519 from 10 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Durham
Governance
- 18 May 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Adam Dunn | Chair | 19 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Lewis-Brannigan | Trustee | 19 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sally-Beth Beetham | Trustee | 15 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Louise Armstrong | Trustee | 03 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
LINDA MARSHALL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Colin Reynolds | Trustee |
|
||||||
SIMON HENIG | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £82.16k | £108.14k | £150.94k | £91.12k | £164.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £75.76k | £72.07k | £106.87k | £141.01k | £166.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £6.26k | £41.62k | £47.67k | £19.66k | £28.52k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 18 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 23 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 21 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 13 MARCH 2009
Charitable objects
3.1 TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE COMMUNITY OF PELTON FELL IN A FULLY INCLUSIVE MANNER BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID COMMUNITY AND STATUTORY AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE COMMUNITY; AND 3.2 TO DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF THE COMMUNITY OF PELTON FELL IN SUCH A WAY THAT LOCAL RESIDENTS ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY AND DEAL WITH MATTERS THAT AFFECT THEM AND SO THAT SUCH RESIDENTS CAN PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Pelton Fell Community Partnership
Brockwell Centre
Craghead Road
Pelton Fell
CHESTER LE STREET
DH2 2NH
- Phone:
- 01913893399
- Email:
- hayley@peltonfell.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window