THE CANAAN CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
EDUCATION/TRAINING THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH OR SAVING OF LIVES THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY RELIGIOUS ACTIVITIES
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Haringey
Governance
- 24 March 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Homes England
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mary Taiwo Onisuru Mrs | Trustee | 24 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
MR MANNY OMIDEYI | Trustee |
|
||||||
CHRISTINA AYINKE OMIDEYI | Trustee |
|
||||||
FUNMI PAUL-TAIWO | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JERRY IFESINACHI IFEACHO | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.23k | £17.11k | £16.38k | £19.57k | £17.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.13k | £9.89k | £10.26k | £17.86k | £14.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 20 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 16 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11 JANUARY 2009
Charitable objects
1 TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT 2 TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND TO PROMOTE AND PRESERVE GOOD HEALTH BY THE PROVISION OF FUNDS, GOODS OR SERVICES OF ANY KIND, INCLUDING THROUGH THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT, AND 3 TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Nutwood House
Nutwood Gardens
Cheshunt
WALTHAM CROSS
Hertfordshire
EN7 6UP
- Phone:
- 01992926470
- Email:
- church@canaanlondon.org
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window