Trustees NORTH ALLERDALE DEVELOPMENT TRUST LIMITED
Charity Number: 1131992

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DENISE PHILLIPS | Chair | 11 April 2011 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL STUART HEANEY | Trustee | 25 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
JACQUELINE ROBINSON | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
ALAN CLIFFORD PITCHER | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
DAVID MICHAEL HORTON | Trustee | 11 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
MALCOLM IRVINE WILSON | Trustee | 11 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Diane Shona Walker | Trustee | 18 April 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.