EXETER FOOD BANK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Exeter Food Bank provides short term food supplies to local people in crisis referred to us by a number of agencies and charities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
170 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Devon
Governance
- 25 March 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sarah Hornblower | Trustee | 18 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ian Robertson | Trustee | 20 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Fowler | Trustee | 20 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Davis | Trustee | 18 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Richard Judd | Trustee | 18 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gary Flint | Trustee | 13 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Gerry Hunt | Trustee | 31 July 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £62.37k | £191.37k | £251.67k | £136.70k | £224.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £48.13k | £63.77k | £96.15k | £132.26k | £187.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 27 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 27 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 31 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 31 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 23 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 23 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 22 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 22 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 26 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 26 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 8 OCTOBER 2008
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PERSONS IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE IN THE WORLD WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS (BENEFICIARIES) IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE IN THE WORLD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Exeter Food Bank
174-175 Cowick Street
EXETER
EX4 1AA
- Phone:
- 07818 226 524
- Email:
- info@exeterfoodbank.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window