POLICY CENTRE FOR AFRICAN PEOPLES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Policy Centre for African Peoples (PCAP) was created in 2008 to enable African and disadvantaged individuals of all ethnic origins to improve their lives through education, leadership and engagement. Thus, PCAP envisions a world where personal and collective prosperity, justice and common good stem from better education, leadership and social engagement. For more info visit www.pcap.org.uk
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £14,755 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£70k to £80k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 14 August 2009: Standard registration
- AFRICAN PEOPLES ADVOCACY (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Thelma Okey-Adibe | Chair | 06 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Eneless Nyoni | Trustee | 08 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Antonique Adriana Afonso | Trustee | 10 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joshua Chukwudi Aghadiuno | Trustee | 12 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
OLAJIDE ALABI | Trustee | 21 July 2022 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.54k | £37.40k | £135.12k | £167.21k | £167.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.88k | £25.32k | £100.80k | £126.37k | £123.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £7.01k | N/A | N/A | £19.21k | £14.76k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 10 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 11 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 05 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 10 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14/03/2009 AS AMENDED ON 24/04/2010 AS AMENDED ON 06/07/2013 as amended on 27 Jul 2023
Charitable objects
1 THE PROMOTION OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY: (A) PROMOTING KNOWLEDGE AND MUTUAL UNDERSTANDING BETWEEN DIFFERENT RACIAL GROUPS AND GENDERS; (B) ADVANCING EDUCATION AND RAISING AWARENESS ABOUT DIFFERENT RACIAL GROUPS AND GENDERS TO PROMOTE GOOD RELATIONS BETWEEN PERSONS OF DIFFERENT RACIAL GROUPS AND GENDERS; (C) THE ELIMINATION OF DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF RACE OR GENDER; 2. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AMONGST AFRICAN COMMUNITIES WORLD-WIDE.
Area of benefit
WORLD-WIDE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Broadside
Leviathan Way
Chatham
Kent
- Phone:
- 07765414274
- Email:
- info@pcap.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window