Perfect Solution Foundation

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Relief of poverty through the provision of educational resources, materials and financial support: B.Promoting and protecting Health and Well-being of children and young people,family through provision of support, education and practical advice in Newcastle and Gateshead: C. Helping them develop their skills, capacity and capabilities to enable them participate in society and inclusion
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Gateshead
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
- Nigeria
Governance
- 26 March 2009: Standard registration
- Perfect Solutions Foundation (Working name)
- PHINA NWOYE FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- POVERTY SOLUTION FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PHINA NWOYE | Chair |
|
|
|||||||
Dr Tonti Tochi Ndubuisi | Trustee | 18 January 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Rev JOHN BABATOPE AMEOBI PHD | Trustee |
|
||||||||
Dr BETTY NWABINEU | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
Prof EPHRAIM NWOYE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
Dr NWACHUKWU JAMES NWABEINELI | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.00k | £7.00k | £9.70k | £13.30k | £20.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.00k | £5.80k | £9.00k | £12.20k | £17.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.50k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 26 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED MADE 2 MARCH 2009 as amended on 22 Mar 2018 as amended on 01 Mar 2022 as amended on 31 Aug 2024
Charitable objects
The charity?s objects are, for the public benefit: The relief of poverty in the world through the provision of educational resources and materials and financial support. To act as a resource for young people and their families living in Newcastle, Gateshead and surrounding areas, by providing advice and assistance as a means of: (a) advancing in life and helping young people by developing their skills, capacities and capabilities to enable them to participate in society as independent, mature and responsible individuals; (b) promoting and protecting the mental health of young people through the provision of support, education and practical advice.
Area of benefit
THE WORLD
Contact information
- Address:
-
55 MONDAY CRESCENT
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE
NE4 5BG
- Phone:
- 07999714763
- Email:
- phina.nwoye@yahoo.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window