DERBY PENTECOSTAL CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Derby Pentecostal Church (DPC) is committed to enabling as many people as possible to worship at our church and to become part of our parish community.Sunday worship is from 10:00-12:30hr., which is followed by sunday school. In addition to the Sunday worship, prayer meetings are also held 3 times a week, in Belper, Nottingham, and Burton-upon-Trent.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Derby City
- Nottingham City
Governance
- 01 April 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev CHARUVIL THOMAS ABRAHAM | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Shibu Thomas | Trustee | 05 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
ABIN ABRAHAM | Trustee | 02 August 2015 |
|
|
||||
KORULLA PLANCHIRAYIL KOSHY | Trustee | 24 September 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £28.39k | £26.39k | £49.23k | £45.10k | £45.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.65k | £16.22k | £41.76k | £29.51k | £35.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 04 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 04 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 14 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 14 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 09 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 09 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2020
(These accounts |
14 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 21 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 21 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15 MARCH
Charitable objects
(A) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEE BOARD FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT; (B) TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND TO PROMOTE AND PRESERVE GOOD HEALTH BY THE PROVISION OF FUNDS, GOODS OR SERVICES OF ANY KIND INCLUDING THROUGH THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEE BOARD FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT; AND (C) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEE BOARD FORM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 Siddons Street
Alvaston
DERBY
DE24 0EU
- Phone:
- 01332906979
- Email:
- pastorctabraham@yahoo.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window