Financial history CITY OF BRISTOL ROWING CLUB

Charity number: 1128832
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £204.23k £116.69k £141.45k £232.34k £209.68k
Total expenditure £177.74k £62.27k £142.10k £185.66k £194.12k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £5.00k N/A N/A N/A