THE OXFORD LITERARY FESTIVAL

Charity number: 1128820

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The objective of the charity is to advance education by promoting and providing opportunities for the appreciation, understanding and enjoyment of literature and the arts, in particular through the promotion and running of a literary festival in Oxford.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 June 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 26 March 2009: Standard registration
  • 09 October 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
  • 10 November 2011: Re-registered
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jarl Michael Severn Chair 14 September 2022
None on record
Louisa Treger Trustee 24 October 2024
None on record
Anthony James Moxon Lowther-Pinkerton Trustee 07 December 2021
None on record
Yasmin Alibhai-Brown Trustee 07 December 2021
None on record
Ben Okri Trustee 09 December 2020
None on record
Kate Farquhar-Thomson Trustee 29 April 2020
None on record
Paul Thomas Richard Simons Trustee 29 April 2020
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023
Total gross income £552.06k £124.39k £28.62k £420.15k £550.29k
Total expenditure £603.85k £227.79k £84.11k £443.30k £539.58k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £293.71k N/A N/A N/A £59.43k
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities £258.35k N/A N/A N/A £477.59k
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment £0 N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A £13.28k
Income - Legacies £0 N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £603.85k N/A N/A N/A £539.58k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Governance £3.24k N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023
Own use assets £406 N/A N/A N/A £0
Long-term investments £0 N/A N/A N/A £585
Other assets £43.20k N/A N/A N/A £38.90k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 N/A N/A N/A £0
Total liabilities £211.73k N/A N/A N/A £378.93k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 2 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 2 days
Annual return 30 June 2023 15 July 2024 76 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 08 August 2024 100 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 28 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 28 April 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 21 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 21 April 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 23 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 09 April 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
c/o Gravita Oxford LLP
First Floor, Park Central
40-41 Park End Street
OXFORD
OX1 1JD
Phone:
0207 381 3637