HELPING HANDS MISSION AGAINST POVERTY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
HHAM is operated by individuals who are passionate about the commission of Jesus Christ - He said, 'Freely you have received freely give'. We provide water in villages suffering drought, educational assistance, funds to buy medication, and goats for projects to promote self sustainability. We thank God for the kindness to the men, women and children who are recipients of your gifts and prayers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Other Charitable Activities
- Jamaica
- Kenya
Governance
- 27 March 2009: Standard registration
- HELPING HAND AFRICA MISSION (Previous name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ann Gosling | Trustee | 13 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
ETHNEY ANDERSON | Trustee | 13 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Chantal Liverpol Lolos | Trustee | 01 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Icely Brown | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
ADOLPHUS CHISHOLM Pastor | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CARMEN CAROL CHISHOLM | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.77k | £19.09k | £15.00k | £29.67k | £23.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.35k | £12.80k | £16.00k | £31.33k | £28.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 11 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 12 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 17 April 2024 | 72 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 29 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 18 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 24 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 30/11/2008 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 15/03/2014
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION, RELIEVE POVERTY, PRESSURE AND PROTECT THE HEALTH AND RELIEVE SICKNESS OF THE CHILDREN AND YOUNG ADULTS LIVING IN AFRICA BY ANY CHARITABLE MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
AFRICA
Contact information
- Address:
-
1A RIDGEHURST AVENUE
WATFORD
WD25 7AZ
- Phone:
- 07961417838
- Email:
- roycarm@ntlworld.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window