THE INSPIRE AND ACHIEVE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
IAF inspire young people to work towards a positive future by providing activities that improve their approach, attitude & behaviours towards education, employment and volunteering. We deliver outreach projects and workshops in partnership with colleges, charities, and employment support agencies, and provide basic IAG so young people can find the help and support they need to progress.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 05 May 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alexandra Peace-Gadsby | Chair | 09 October 2014 |
|
|||||||
Elizabeth Ann Barrett | Trustee | 03 October 2023 |
|
|||||||
MATTHEW WILLIAM ROONEY | Trustee | 08 November 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Yvonne Card | Trustee | 08 June 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £482.94k | £438.19k | £853.03k | £1.18m | £456.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £454.12k | £382.55k | £912.98k | £1.29m | £417.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £392.24k | N/A | N/A | £391.17k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £9.50k | N/A | £6.75k | £9.00k | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £1.45k | £2.70k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | £7.44k | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £815.79k | £1.17m | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £35.79k | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £906.50k | £1.27m | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £6.49k | £14.18k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £21.47k | £24.37k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 10 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 10 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 26 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 26 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 12 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 12 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 29 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | 29 January 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 17 MARCH 2009
Charitable objects
1 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE FROM REGENERATION AREAS (THE 'YOUNG PEOPLE') 2 TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND HELP THE YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH A THE PROVISION OF ADVICE AND EDUCATIONAL ACTIVITIES PROVIDED IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, DESIGNED TO HELP IMPROVE THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE; AND B PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Inspire and Achieve Foundation
39D Stockwell Gate
Mansfield
Nottinghamshire
NG18 1LA
- Phone:
- 07891529797
- Email:
- info@inspireachieve.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window