Financial history GL11 COMMUNITY PROJECT

Charity number: 1130096
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £444.68k £635.80k £547.14k £753.92k £868.11k
Total expenditure £392.34k £466.70k £555.39k £646.06k £867.65k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £160.74k £267.93k £162.29k £259.58k £370.65k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £615.68k £73.96k £702.06k £813.98k
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A £0 £454.22k £26.79k £41.10k
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £1.54k £1.22k £3.91k £9.61k
Income - Other N/A £18.58k £17.75k £21.16k £3.42k
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £433.69k £519.38k £616.77k £831.14k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £33.01k £36.01k £29.29k £36.51k
Expenditure - Governance N/A £2.70k £120.89k £146.30k £158.87k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 £0 £0 £48.16k
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0