Financial history CAMBO WRAPAROUND

Charity number: 1128888
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £79.54k £43.71k £61.00k £47.51k £51.10k
Total expenditure £57.13k £57.51k £63.09k £61.50k £58.96k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £51.61k £35.35k £42.89k £30.13k £32.45k