NOAH'S ARK MISSIONS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Relief of poverty/catering for animal welfare advancement of basic education
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2016
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Hackney
- Brazil
- Brunei
- Egypt
- Ethiopia
- Haiti
- Kenya
- Nigeria
- Sudan
- Switzerland
- Togo
- United States
- Zambia
Governance
- 11 June 2009: Standard registration
- 26 November 2019: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.13k | £18.56k | £8.25k | £2.58k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.13k | £17.95k | £7.64k | £2.58k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 27 January 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 18 MARCH 2009 AS AMENDED 17 MAY 2009
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND OVERSEAS A THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING B THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS C THE PROMOTION OF GOOD HEALTH AND D THE ADVANCEMENT OF CHRISTIAN RELIGION
Area of benefit
THE UNITED KINGDOM AND OVERSEAS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window