MSH GOREEB TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A completion of survey in 2009. Fund-raising events held in the UK. Trip to Bangladesh in Nov 2010. Helped those in need the most from the information on our survey. Built 48 tin roofs providing shelter. 20 water pumps for sanitation and basic living. 3 sewing machine for financial self support. Medication for 50 people for their basic health needs. All this has helped towards a successful year.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Other Charitable Activities
- Tower Hamlets
- Bangladesh
Governance
- 31 July 2009: Standard registration
- MSH BUDBARIBAZAR UNION TRUST (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SUFIA BEGUM | Trustee | 01 February 2009 |
|
|
||||
Mohammed Somshul Hoque | Trustee | 01 February 2009 |
|
|
||||
TASRIN SHAHANA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.30k | £4.00k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.80k | £1.70k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 07 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 07 September 2024 | 69 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 07 September 2024 | 435 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 21 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 21 March 2022 | 264 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26/05/2009 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 16/09/2011
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF PEOPLE OF BANGLADESHI ORIGIN HAILING FROM BUDARIBAZAR UNION IN GOLAPGONG SUB DISTRICT OF BANGLADESH IN THE UK AND PEOPLE OF BUDBARIBAZAR UNION IN BANGLADESH BY A THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING B THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS C THE PROMOTION OF GOOD HEALTH D THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE
Area of benefit
BUDARIBAZAR UNION IN GOLAPGONG
Contact information
- Address:
-
25 MONTHOPE ROAD
LONDON
E1 5LL
- Phone:
- 07931318114
- Email:
- somshulhoque@yahoo.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window