Financial history SUSTAINABILITY AND ENVIRONMENTAL EDUCATION

Charity number: 1129275
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £28.61k £17.04k £56.17k £59.69k £105.30k
Total expenditure £18.52k £21.75k £30.92k £52.31k £64.35k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £9.50k N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £9.50k £12.00k