MUSICLINKS LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
MusicLinks looks to assist disadvantaged people and communities by: Responding to the needs of people living in isolated and/or rural areas Delivering innovative education workshops Providing mobile digital arts and sensory resources for those with SEN We work primarily in Cumbria. We also work further afield when the need/opportunity arises.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
142 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 23 July 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANDREW DEAKIN | Trustee | 29 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
James Darrington | Trustee | 11 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Downs | Trustee | 11 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Anthony John Wallis | Trustee | 03 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW CRAIGIE MCKAY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.75k | £33.86k | £27.46k | £45.91k | £45.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.93k | £23.08k | £31.05k | £46.25k | £48.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £800 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 25 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 25 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 28 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 28 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 24 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 24 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 19 July 2021 | 19 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 30 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 17 FEBRUARY 2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 25 JUNE 2009
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE ART OF MUSIC
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
WOODSIDE
GARTH ROW
UNDERBARROW
KENDAL
CUMBRIA
- Phone:
- 01539568165
- Email:
- musiclinks1@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window