Financial history CHRIST APOSTOLIC CHURCH (DYNAMIC CHRISTIAN CENTRE)

Charity number: 1130852
Charity reporting is up to date (11 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023
Total gross income £66.82k £57.91k £43.15k £42.81k £50.95k
Total expenditure £64.19k £50.86k £51.23k £47.26k £48.88k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A