FRIENDS OF WESSEX ASSISTING DOGS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide support and guidance to disabled people with assisting dogs in the Wessex area. We raise awareness and funding for: Cancer and Bio detection dogs, Canine Partners,Dog Aid,Dogs for the Disabled,Guide Dogs,Hearing Dogs for Deaf People,Medical Alert Dogs,Seeing Dogs Alliance and Support/Seizure Alert Do. We give talks,fund raise in the wider community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bournemouth
- Dorset
- Hampshire
- Poole
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 07 July 2009: Standard registration
- 13 January 2025: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- 13 January 2025: Funds transferred to 1124533 MEDICAL DETECTION DOGS
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.55k | £1.62k | £5.68k | £1.04k | £3.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.35k | £6.42k | £5.85k | £5.14k | £14.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 07 August 2024 | 38 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 21 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 26 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 09 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 25 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 4 MARCH 2009
Charitable objects
1) THE RELIEF OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM A DISABILITY THROUGH SEEKING TO IMPROVE ACCESS FOR PEOPLE WHO DEPEND ON ASSISTANCE DOGS IN PUBLIC PLACES SUCH AS BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION, SUPERMARKET, RESTAURANTS AND ON PUBLIC TRANSPORT AND WHICH MIGHT NOT BE ACCESSIBLE TO THEM. 2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC REGARDING THE NEEDS AND RIGHTS OF PEOPLE SUFFERING FROM A DISABILITY WHO DEPEND ON ASSISTANCE DOGS IN PUBLIC PLACES.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window