Financial history KWA MKONO DISABLED CHILDREN'S TRUST

Charity number: 1130429
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £64.75k £46.87k £30.69k £51.20k £23.53k
Total expenditure £67.41k £48.45k £36.74k £43.60k £24.14k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A