THE ROCK CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing Church services, youth activities, Adult life groups, Bible studies, drop in centre, Food bank and community projects. Parent & Toddler groups. Supporting training initiatives for ?back to work?, youth employment preparation, work placement training. Providing resources for anti-slavery awareness, orphanage support, etc Running Christianity awareness programmes such as Alpha.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Birmingham City
- Sandwell
- Walsall
- Wolverhampton
Governance
- 04 August 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Ian Lewis Evans | Chair |
|
||||||
Conrad David Gayle | Trustee | 21 November 2021 |
|
|||||
Andrew Edwin James | Trustee | 21 November 2015 |
|
|||||
HANNAH JOY EVANS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £186.25k | £214.95k | £162.24k | £209.58k | £323.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £139.73k | £91.05k | £109.92k | £135.36k | £491.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £59.17k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 02 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 02 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 16 MARCH 2009
Charitable objects
(A) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT (B) TO RELIEVE PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED OR HARDSHIP AND TO RELIEVE THE DISTRESS CAUSED THEREBY, ON SUCH OCCASION AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Rock Church
The Rock Centre
Lichfield House
27-31 Lichfield Street
Walsall
West Mid
- Phone:
- 01922441721
- Email:
- info@therockchurch.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window