Financial history WIGAN WARRIORS COMMUNITY FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1129008
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2019 30/11/2020 30/11/2021 30/11/2022 30/11/2023
Total gross income £387.50k £336.34k £452.51k £509.00k £446.74k
Total expenditure £382.54k £325.34k £477.84k £494.00k £454.22k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £47.00k £52.00k £60.00k
Income from government grants £100.77k £62.00k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £93.00k N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £416.00k N/A
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £442.00k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £52.00k N/A