THE JOINT COUNCIL OF THE BRIDGE BENEFICE, COVENTRY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PROMOTING IN THE PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

13 Trustee(s)
108 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Coventry City
Governance
- 06 April 2009: Previously excepted registration
- 15 January 2024: Funds received from 1103573 KIDZ KLUB COVENTRY
- THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JOHN BAPTIST,WESTWOOD,COVENTRY (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev David Geoffrey Hammond | Chair | 11 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
Carolyn Martina Howarth | Trustee | 18 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lydia Sampson | Trustee | 18 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Abigail Julie Baxter | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michael Lane | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Graham Richard Thomas | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Erin Victoria Gilmour | Trustee | 30 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Xandra Hammond | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Charlotte Robinson | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Matt Jermyn | Trustee | 17 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
THOMAS KENNARD HICKINBOTTOM | Trustee | 17 November 2020 |
|
|||||
Jeff Smailes | Trustee | 01 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jan Sayer | Trustee | 17 April 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £279.31k | £207.89k | £280.82k | £243.85k | £271.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £350.40k | £228.81k | £243.04k | £267.25k | £275.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 03 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 03 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 15 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 15 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 08 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 08 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 25 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 25 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 22 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES as amended on 26 Oct 2020
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Bridge Coventry
St John's Church, Westwood
45 Westwood Heath Road
Coventry
CV4 8GN
- Phone:
- 02476695026
- Email:
- admin@thebridgecoventry.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window