UMMAH AID

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Run advice information sessions on issues affecting people lives Run capacity building Training sessions for members, volunteers and management Committee members. Raise funds for good causes and donate to the needy people in UK and in Bangladesh.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout London
- Bangladesh
Governance
- 08 May 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR Abdul Kadir | Trustee | 20 September 2017 |
|
|||||
Naima Bibi | Trustee | 12 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rahima Bibi | Trustee | 02 May 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.38k | £5.50k | £3.70k | £6.50k | £7.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.19k | £2.50k | £2.30k | £3.00k | £4.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 March 2024 | 54 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 07 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 03 February 2022 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 12 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 3 MAY 2009
Charitable objects
'FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS LIVING IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF TOWER HAMLETS AND IN PARTICULAR MEMBERS OF THE BANGLADESHI COMMUNITY BY: (1) RELIEVING POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS THROUGH THE PROVISION OF ADVICE AND INFORMATION TO THE SAID INHABITANTS IN NEED OF SUCH ADVICE THAT MAY INCLUDE WELFARE BENEFITS, HEALTH AND EMPLOYMENT, (2) ADVANCING EDUCATION IN PARTICULAR THE PROVISION OF LANGUAGE AND OTHER SUBJECT CLASSES. (3) THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS HAVING NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES
Area of benefit
LONDON BOROUGH OF TOWER HAMLETS
Contact information
- Address:
-
191 Roman Road
LONDON
E2 0QY
- Phone:
- 07949039608
- Email:
- ummahaid2008@aol.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window