THE BRISTOL PHOENIX CHOIR

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Study and practice of choral music to foster public knowledge and appreciation of music by means of public performance. To advance, improve, develop and maintain education in the art and science of music as the trustees see fit.To further such charitable purpose or purposes as the trustees in their absolute discretion shall think fit but in particular through the making of grants and donations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
54 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bath And North East Somerset
- Bristol City
- North Somerset
- South Gloucestershire
Governance
- 16 September 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Elaine Joy Flint | Chair | 28 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Steffan Gwyn Davies | Trustee | 04 February 2025 |
|
|||||
David Leslie Brown | Trustee | 10 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mervyn Bromley Amesbury | Trustee | 12 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Misha Chidgey | Trustee | 28 June 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.64k | £8.03k | £11.25k | £18.61k | £13.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.08k | £3.58k | £9.97k | £22.57k | £12.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 06 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 22 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 25 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 15 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 9 SEPTEMBER 2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 2 JUNE 2009 as amended on 28 Jun 2022
Charitable objects
1. THE STUDY AND PRACTICE OF CHORAL MUSIC IN ORDER TO FOSTER PUBLIC KNOWLEDGE AND APPRECIATION OF SUCH MUSIC BY MEANS OF PUBLIC PERFORMANCE; 2. TO ADVANCE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN EDUCATION IN THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS BY ANY MEANS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT; 3. TO FURTHER SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION SHALL THINK FIT BUT IN PARTICULAR THROUGH THE MAKING OF GRANTS AND DONATIONS."
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
10 BIRBECK ROAD
BRISTOL
BS9 1BD
- Phone:
- 01179684112
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window