FRIENDS OF QUEEN MARY'S SIDCUP LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fund raising for the benefit of Queen Mary's Hospital Sidcup through the management of a Cafe and Kiosk on the hospital site. These provide a comprehensive service to patients, relatives and staff. The service is provided through approximately 40 volunteers working on a managed rota basis.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
34 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Bexley
Governance
- 18 May 2009: Standard registration
- FRIENDS OF QUEEN MARY'S HOSPITAL LIMITED (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PHILIP BENSON WOODMAN | Chair |
|
||||||
Erbay Rushden | Trustee | 07 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul Edward Davidson | Trustee | 01 March 2022 |
|
|||||
DAVID CHARLES DENNIS | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|||||
SANDRA GROOMBRIDGE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR CHRIS ELMS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £66.99k | £11.86k | £164 | £30.02k | £50.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £51.21k | £12.89k | £7.88k | £7.29k | £18.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 20 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 06 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 06 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 24 FEBRUARY 2009 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME 20 APRIL 2009.
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PATIENTS AND FORMER PATIENTS OF QUEEN MARY'S HOSPITAL, SIDCUP, KENT (HEREINAFTER CALLED 'THE HOSPITAL') WHO ARE SICK, CONVALESCENT, DISABLED, HANDICAPPED, INFIRM OR IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, GENERALLY TO SUPPORT THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE HOSPITAL AND TO BE A SUCCESSOR TO THE LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF QUEEN MARY'S HOSPITAL, SIDCUP,
Area of benefit
SIDCUP, KENT
Contact information
- Address:
-
QUEEN MARYS HOSPITAL
FROGNAL AVENUE
SIDCUP
DA14 6LT
- Phone:
- 02083026589
- Email:
- friendsofqmh@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window