FRIENDS OF THE HOLY LAND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
CARRYING OUT HUMANITARIAN SUPPORT RELATING TO HOUSING, EDUCATION AND THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY AND SICKNESS TO THE CHRISTIAN COMMUNITES OF ALL DENOMINATIONS IN THE AREAS IN WHICH WE OPERATE.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Israel
- Jordan
- Occupied Palestinian Territories
Governance
- 09 June 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rt Rev James Curry | Trustee | 26 January 2023 |
|
|||||||
Susan Oliver | Trustee | 26 January 2023 |
|
|||||||
Mary Gail Brown | Trustee | 29 September 2022 |
|
|||||||
Michael Francis Swinburne | Trustee | 01 July 2021 |
|
|||||||
Rev David John Hasting Longe | Trustee | 09 April 2019 |
|
|||||||
Dr CHARLES REED | Trustee | 13 November 2012 |
|
|
||||||
Dr DAVID RYALL | Trustee | 04 July 2011 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £561.02k | £885.81k | £805.34k | £877.76k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £573.37k | £812.41k | £834.12k | £802.85k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £544.81k | £860.67k | £771.35k | £831.17k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £45.91k | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £15.15k | £24.45k | £33.54k | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £1.06k | £691 | £441 | £684 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £30.00k | £91.64k | £21.02k | £47.17k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £561.88k | £802.14k | £817.84k | £772.58k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £11.50k | £10.26k | £16.28k | £30.27k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £720 | £720 | £1.15k | £1.15k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 05 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 05 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 12 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 12 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 04 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 04 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 23 MARCH 2009
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGION AND ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN EACH CASE IN ISRAEL, PALESTINE, JORDAN AND CYPRUS (TOGETHER THE "HOLY LAND") BY IMPROVING THE QUALITY OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING IN, AND PROVIDING FINANCIAL SUPPORT TO, SCHOOLS, EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENTS AND PARISHES, PRINCIPALLY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, RUN BY THE LATIN PATRIARCHATE OF JERUSALEM, FOR MEMBERS OF THE CHRISTIAN COMMUNITY IN THE HOLY LAND; AND THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY AND SICKNESS IN THE HOLY LAND BY FINANCIAL SUPPORT, ORGANISATION OF SELF-HELP PROJECTS, PURCHASE OF GOODS AND ARTEFACTS OF ALL KINDS FROM MEMBERS OF THE CHRISTIAN COMMUNITY FOR RE-SALE BY THE CHARITY AND THROUGH ANY OTHER MEANS BY WHICH THEIR QUALITY OF LIFE CAN BE IMPROVED
Area of benefit
ISRAEL, PALESTINE, JORDAN AND CYPRUS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Friends of the Holy Land
Farmer Ward Road
KENILWORTH
CV8 2DH
- Phone:
- 01926512980
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window