BASIL HOWARD TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of the charity is the promotion or furtherance or maintenance or improvement of the facilities for the education of pupils at Addey and Stanhope School.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Lewisham
Governance
- 07 April 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MICHAEL SCOTT-MACDONALD | Trustee | 20 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
JANICE SHAPIRO | Trustee | 06 January 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.10k | £6.39k | £7.73k | £9.82k | £11.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.75k | £7.71k | £7.52k | £8.33k | £13.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 08 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 05 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 29 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 29 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
AGREEMENT DATED 27 APRIL 1994 SUPPLEMENTAL TO THE WILL DATED 10 JANUARY 1973 (WILL AND CODICIL PROVED 26 OCTOBER 1979)
Charitable objects
FOR THE PROMOTION OR FURTHERANCE OR MAINTENANCE OR IMPROVEMENT OF THE FACILITIES FOR THE EDUCATION (WHETHER GENERAL TECHNICAL OR PROFESSIONAL) AND THE MENTAL AND PHYSICAL FITNESS OF PAST PRESENT OR FUTURE PUPILS AT THE SAID ADDEY & STANHOPE SCHOOL OR THE SUCCESSOR SCHOOL AS THE SPECIAL TRUSTEE SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE AND UNCONTROLLED DISCRETION THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
PARISHES OF ST NICHOLAS AND ST PAUL, DEPTFORD
Contact information
- Address:
-
ADDEY & STANHOPE SCHOOL
472 NEW CROSS ROAD
LONDON
SE14 6TJ
- Phone:
- 02083056100
- Email:
- info@as.lewisham.sch.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window