WILLIAM ROBINSON GRAVETYE CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our mission is to secure and share the legacy of influential wild gardener William Robinson (1838-1935) with the public through Gravetye Estate, Sussex. Our vision is to improve biodiversity and to develop a Climate Change and disease resilient woodland landscape through exemplary stewardship and experimentation. We will help people to learn from nature through William Robinson's teachings.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
144 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- East Sussex
Governance
- 06 December 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
julia catherine Grant | Chair | 02 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Julianus Fredericus Maria van Kan | Trustee | 01 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard Alexander Leman OBE | Trustee | 01 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Martin Clifford Bellamy | Trustee | 01 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter Douglas Langdon Latham OBE | Trustee | 05 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Hugh Jonathan Watson Bullock C.V.O. | Trustee | 02 July 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £175.25k | £140.09k | £168.46k | £217.54k | £295.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £236.81k | £161.78k | £146.72k | £400.17k | £305.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 03 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 03 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 11 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 19 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 19 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 16 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 9 APRIL 2009
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE ALL OBJECTS WHICH ARE REGARDED AS EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE UNDER THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND IN PARTICULAR TO SERVE AS THE CORPORATE TRUSTEE OF THE 1936 CHARITY AND THEREBY PRESERVE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE LAND AT WEST HOATHLY KNOWN AS GRAVETYE MANOR ESTATE, THE WOODLANDS AND WILDLIFE THEREON, AND THE MANOR HOUSE KNOWN AS GRAVETYE MANOR AND SURROUNDING GARDENS.
Area of benefit
WEST HOATHLY
Linked charities
- 06 December 2010 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
34 DALKEITH GROVE
STANMORE
HA7 4SG
- Phone:
- 02089585390
- Email:
- info@wrgc.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window