Financial history SHILLINGSTONE RECREATION GROUND

Charity number: 1130064
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2011 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £15.50k £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £24.14k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A