KENYA CHARITABLE ORGANISATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide feeding centres, donate educational materials to schools, donate medical equipments to hospitals, help build houses for displaced Kenya, provide education maintenance allowances for students from poor backgrounds, provide bursaries, build wells in draught stricken areas and provide relief materials such as food and clothings for Kenyans in times of disasters
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Kenya
Governance
- 13 May 2009: Standard registration
- THE KENYA FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Julius Kariuki Muiruri | Trustee |
|
||||||||||
IRENE MWAI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
Dr JOYCE MUIRURI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
SHEBORA MOHAMED KAMARA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.91k | £9.50k | £8.75k | £8.16k | £8.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.25k | £7.46k | £6.30k | £5.23k | £5.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 28 August 2024 | 181 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 04 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 25 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 19 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26 APRIL 2009
Charitable objects
1. TO OVERCOME OR RELIEVE POVERTY AND SUFFERING OF THOSE MEMBERS OF THE POPULATION OF KENYA, WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR IN DISTRESS AND ARE IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES. 2. TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE HEALTH OF SUCH PEOPLE AND THEIR FAMILIES THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES, SERVICES AND PUBLIC AWARENESS. 3. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF THESE PEOPLE IN NEED SO THAT THEY CAN PROGRESS IN LIFE.
Area of benefit
KENYA
Contact information
- Address:
-
KENYA CHARITABLE ORGANISATION
35-39 LONDON STREET
READING
BERKSHIRE
RG1 4PS
- Phone:
- 07960820525
- Website:
-
WWW.KENYACHARITABLEORGANISATION.ORG.UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window