RFL FACILITIES TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
In accordance with the objects of the company as set out in its Memorandum of Association, the principal activity of RFL Facilities Trust is to provide such financial and other assistance as the trustees shall deem fit for the provision, establishment, development and improvement of facilities for the playing of rugby league or rugby league in conjunction with other sports.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 14 April 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robert Kenneth Hicks | Trustee | 11 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Robert Graham | Trustee | 06 March 2024 | ||||||
Matthew Hutchinson | Trustee | 09 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Antony Sutton | Trustee | 19 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
JONATHAN HUGH HYLAND | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £263 | £126 | £35 | £250.80k | £10.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.20k | £7.29k | £23.76k | £5.48k | £33.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 January 2024 | 71 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 10 January 2024 | 71 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 02 November 2022 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 14 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 10 MARCH 2009
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AT LARGE, TO PROMOTE ALL PURPOSES RECOGNISABLE AS CHARITABLE UNDER THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES FROM TIME TO TIME IN PARTICULAR (BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY) BY PROVIDING SUCH FINANCIAL AND OTHER ASSISTANCE AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DEEM FIT FOR THE PROVISION, ESTABLISHMENT, DEVELOPMENT AND IMPROVEMENT OF FACILITIES FOR THE PLAYING OF RUGBY LEAGUE OR RUGBY LEAGUE IN CONJUNCTION WITH OTHER SPORTS ('FACILITIES' MEANS LAND AND BUILDINGS (INCLUDING PITCHES, PAVILIONS AND STADIA), EQUIPMENT AND ORGANISING SPORTING EVENTS AND RELATED ACTIVITIES).
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
RFL Facilities Trust
Rowsley Street
MANCHESTER
M11 3FF
- Phone:
- 07595086874
- Email:
- katie.jones@rfl.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window