Financial history THE KLIMT CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity Number: 1129133
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £18.00k £18.00k £18.00k £18.00k £18.00k
Total expenditure £7.28k £3.80k £31.41k £4.99k £49.27k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A