Trustees FARNDALE VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 1131786

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JAMES STUART THURTELL | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Richard Alan Smith | Trustee | 08 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Ian Marden | Trustee | 02 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Philip Leslie Collier | Trustee | 02 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
PETER DAVID DOWSLAND | Trustee | 29 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
JASON FERDINANDO | Trustee | 29 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
JOANNE ELIZABETH LOGGIE | Trustee | 31 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
MR BARRY SUNLEY | Trustee | 02 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
ANDY FAWBERT | Trustee | 28 March 2011 |
|
|
||||
ANN POTTER | Trustee | 28 March 2011 |
|
|
||||
GILLIAN ACONLEY | Trustee | 27 March 2011 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD EDWARD POTTER | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.