Financial history LITTLE DUCKLINGS PRE-SCHOOL BASINGSTOKE

Charity number: 1132767
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £128.21k £120.43k £142.20k £142.95k £152.67k
Total expenditure £136.54k £121.10k £134.03k £125.72k £132.85k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £78.87k £72.07k £88.71k £78.05k £80.10k