Trustees LITTLE DUCKLINGS PRE-SCHOOL BASINGSTOKE

Charity number: 1132767
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Lucy Grimes Chair 10 December 2021
None on record
Hannah Buckthorpe Trustee 14 October 2024
None on record
Charlotte Miller Trustee 20 June 2023
None on record
Fe Scotting Trustee 16 November 2015
None on record
CATHERINE MANSBRIDGE Trustee 13 June 2012
None on record