TRUE JESUS CHURCH (LONDON)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Seek new followers by preaching in the local area and to truthseekers; encourage and facilitate-provide a place of worship. Raise awareness and understanding of the faith by services/sermons/fellowships. Coordinate the activities of the members. Provide help and spiritual support to members. Issue policies and guidance to members
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Hackney
Governance
- 02 June 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SIAK FAH CHONG | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Binbin Zheng | Trustee | 15 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alexander Joey Hui | Trustee | 19 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ngo Him Wallace Ho | Trustee | 12 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Lawrence Ching Hong Chan | Trustee | 11 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Duncan Shek | Trustee | 10 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
CHAU MUI CHONG | Trustee | 13 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
KON FAH CHONG | Trustee |
|
||||||
KENNETH GUDMIN ZHOU | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £223.22k | £246.01k | £196.83k | £187.71k | £232.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £123.12k | £110.44k | £85.15k | £89.53k | £128.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 03 August 2024 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 03 August 2024 | 4 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 31 July 2023 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 31 July 2023 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 29 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 29 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 24 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 24 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 09 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 09 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 11 APRIL 2009
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE GOSPEL OF JESUS CHRIST FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE FOLLOWING DOCTRINES: ONE TRUE GOD, ONE TRUE CHURCH, WATER BAPTISM, RECEIVING THE HOLY SPIRIT, FOOT WASHING, HOLY COMMUNION AND THE SABBATH.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
TRUE JESUS CHURCH LONDON
57-63 EAST ROAD
LONDON
N1 6AH
- Phone:
- 02072512633
- Email:
- london@tjc.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window