THE WEST ESSEX ALCOHOL AND DRUGS SERVICE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
ADAS provides services to individuals and families affected by addiction issues including the following: - Advice and information - Assessments - Counselling & Psychotherapy - Day care programmes including group activities - Aftercare programmes The ADAS Child and Family Support Services provides: -Child Therapy -Family and Couples therapy -Parenting support
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2018
Total income includes £207,000 from 1 government contract(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Essex
Governance
- 23 April 2009: Standard registration
- 10 February 2022: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £359.84k | £296.68k | £296.83k | £284.33k | £305.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £315.00k | £290.00k | £310.59k | £309.15k | £332.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £216.10k | £216.10k | £207.00k | £207.00k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £2.50k | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | |||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | |||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | |||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 07 January 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | 07 January 2019 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 14 APRIL 2009 as amended on 14 Jan 2019
Charitable objects
1 THE RELIEF OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM PROBLEMS CAUSED BY ADDICTION ISSUES AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE DEVELOPMENT OF COUNSELLING AND COMPLEMENTARY THERAPIES FOR ALL PEOPLE IN NEED OF HEALTH CARE. 2 TO ADVANCE THE HEALTH EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC ON ALL MATTERS RELATING TO SUBSTANCE MISUSE AND, IN PARTICULAR, DEVELOPING HEALTH EDUCATION TO PREVENT SUBSTANCE MISUSE AMONGST YOUNG PEOPLE.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window