Financial history CYRRAEDD CYFIAWNDER CYMRU: REACHING JUSTICE WALES

Charity Number: 1130517
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2013 31/05/2014 31/05/2015 31/05/2016 31/05/2017
Total gross income £9.27k £5.27k £3.74k £7.19k £13.57k
Total expenditure £14.12k £855 £7.65k £538 £12.40k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £0